MN HF608 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Kiel.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Kiel.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural asset sale or rental to beginning farmers income tax credit provided, credit for beginning farmer financial management programs provided, and Rural Finance Authority duties established.
Title
Agricultural asset sale or rental to beginning farmers income tax credit provided, credit for beginning farmer financial management programs provided, and Rural Finance Authority duties established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Kiel. |
2017-03-15 | House | Authors added McDonald and Dettmer. |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1414 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Author added Sparks