MN SF141 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - HF substituted in committee HF234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - HF substituted in committee HF234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal electric utilities and rural electric cooperatives regulation modification
Title
Municipal electric utilities and rural electric cooperatives regulation modification
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] |
Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | HF substituted in committee HF234 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF234 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Governor's action Veto