MN HF234 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor's action Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public Utilities Commission regulation of municipal electric utilities and rural electric cooperatives amended.
Title
Public Utilities Commission regulation of municipal electric utilities and rural electric cooperatives amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 89 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 89 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor's action Veto | |
2017-03-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-26 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-09 | House | Authors added Poston, Lohmer, Erickson, Franson, Vogel, Knoblach, Smith, Kresha, Daniels, and O'Neill. |
2017-02-09 | House | Author stricken Hilstrom. |
2017-02-09 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 89-37 |
2017-02-09 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2017-02-09 | House | Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 9, 2017 |
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Swedzinski. |
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Grossell. |
2017-01-30 | House | Authors added Urdahl and Bahr, C. |
2017-01-26 | House | Authors added Anderson, P., and Lueck. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author stricken Murphy, E. |
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-01-23 | House | Authors added Ecklund, Fabian, Green, Hilstrom, Torkelson. |
2017-01-19 | House | Authors added Marquart; Thissen; Gunther; Murphy, E.; Backer; Bennett; Metsa; and Howe. |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-01-17 | House | Authors added Pelowski, Davids, Nornes, Poppe, Gruenhagen, and Miller. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF141 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - HF substituted in committee HF234