MN SF1367 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Early learning scholarships eligibility modification and data sharing authorization; licensing violation data classification modification; child care assistance program payment data definition expansion; human services display of results of child care licensing reports modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early learning scholarships eligibility modification and data sharing authorization; licensing violation data classification modification; child care assistance program payment data definition expansion; human services display of results of child care licensing reports modification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2019-04-01SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-03-07SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2019-02-18SenateReferred to E-12 Finance and Policy
2019-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1110 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Authors added Miller and Grossell

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback