MN HF1110 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Authors added Miller and Grossell
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Authors added Miller and Grossell
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Early learning scholarships eligibility modified.
Title
Early learning scholarships eligibility modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Miller and Grossell |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added West |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Haley, Baker, Heintzeman, and Kresha |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1367 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Withdrawn and re-referred to E-12 Finance and Policy