MN SF1264 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Anderson
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Anderson
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employee immunization refusal employer discipline or discharge prohibition
Title
Employee immunization refusal employer discipline or discharge prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Author added Anderson |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Authors added Abeler; Dornink |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF533 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Author added Bahr