MN SF1256 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF627
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF627
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eyewitness identification policies best practices for law enforcement requirement
Title
Eyewitness identification policies best practices for law enforcement requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF627 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Author added Hall |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Chief author added Ingebrigtsen |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Latz |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF627 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 90