MN HF627 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement policies required on best practices for eyewitness identifications.
Title
Law enforcement policies required on best practices for eyewitness identifications.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 90 | |
2020-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-16 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1256 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1256, now on General Orders |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-12 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-12 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 12, 2020 |
2020-05-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added O'Neill and Edelson |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1256 (Similar To) 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF627