MN SF1202 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF873
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF873
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime of unauthorized use of the name and mark of portorama elimination
Title
Crime of unauthorized use of the name and mark of portorama elimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF873 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF873 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 43