MN HF873 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Portorama; unauthorized use of name and mark crime eliminated.
Title
Portorama; unauthorized use of name and mark crime eliminated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 92 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 92 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 43 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1202 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1202, now on General Orders |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 15, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1202 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF873