MN SF1158 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soil and water conservation districts provisions modifications
Title
Soil and water conservation districts provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Author added Dahms |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Author stricken Brown |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1327 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Author added Poppe.