MN SF1136 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Companion Animal Board establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Companion Animal Board establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateAuthor added Marty
2023-03-27SenateAuthor added Gustafson
2023-02-27SenateAuthor added Duckworth
2023-02-20SenateAuthor added Housley
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1168 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Authors added Wolgamott and PĂ©rez-Vega

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback