MN SF1114 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State building code frost footing depth changes adoption by border cities authorization
Title
State building code frost footing depth changes adoption by border cities authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Local Government Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1402 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy