MN SF1082 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Wiklund
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Wiklund
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution requesting that Congress clarify that the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment; asking that Congress propose a constitutional amendment to provide such a clarification
Title
Resolution requesting that Congress clarify that the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment; asking that Congress propose a constitutional amendment to provide such a clarification
Sponsors
Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. James Carlson [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Author added Wiklund |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Author added Cwodzinski |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2139 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Authors added Murphy, E.; Sundin; and Carlson, A.