MN HF2139 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Authors added Murphy, E.; Sundin; and Carlson, A.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; a resolution memorializing Congress to clarify that the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; a resolution memorializing Congress to clarify that the rights protected under the Constitution are the rights of natural persons and not the rights of artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not speech under the First Amendment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseAuthors added Murphy, E.; Sundin; and Carlson, A.
2018-04-25HouseAuthor added Hansen.
2018-04-23HouseAuthor added Ward.
2018-04-19HouseAuthor added Hornstein.
2018-04-12HouseAuthors added Schultz and Nelson.
2018-03-29HouseAuthor added Sauke.
2018-03-26HouseAuthor added Halverson
2018-03-14HouseAuthor added Olson.
2018-03-08HouseAuthors added Ecklund and Davnie.
2018-02-20HouseAuthors added Liebling and Pinto.
2017-04-24HouseAuthor added Mariani.
2017-03-07HouseAuthors added Thissen and Lee.
2017-03-06HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1082 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Author added Wiklund

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback