MN SF1012 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Anderson, P.
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Anderson, P.
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Teachers of Color Act strengthening and appropriation
Title
Increase Teachers of Color Act strengthening and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Paul T. Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Author added Anderson, P. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF824 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Author added Tabke