MN HF964 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Cantrell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Cantrell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing supports for persons with mental illnesses funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing supports for persons with mental illnesses funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Hassan |
2019-03-20 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1611 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration