MN HF92 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-11 - Authors added Hicks; Brand
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-11 - Authors added Hicks; Brand
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elevated blood lead concentration level lowered from ten micrograms of lead to 3.5 micrograms.
Title
Elevated blood lead concentration level lowered from ten micrograms of lead to 3.5 micrograms.
Sponsors
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Alicia Kozlowski [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Liz Lee [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Kim Hicks [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-11 | House | Authors added Hicks; Brand |
2023-01-09 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Hollins |
2023-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF162 (Similar To) 2023-01-17 - Author added Maye Quade