MN HF902 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cosmetology continuing education requirements established.
Title
Cosmetology continuing education requirements established.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] |
Sen. Alice Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 79 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-05-03 | House | Bill was passed vote: 79-49 |
2013-05-03 | House | Third reading |
2013-05-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |