MN HF898 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Greenhouse gas reduction goals and strategies added to various state and metropolitan programs and plans, goals established for per capita reduction in vehicle miles driven to reduce greenhouse gases, and money transferred.
Title
Greenhouse gas reduction goals and strategies added to various state and metropolitan programs and plans, goals established for per capita reduction in vehicle miles driven to reduce greenhouse gases, and money transferred.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-04-06 | House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division | |
2009-04-01 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation and Transit Policy and Oversight Division | |
2009-03-30 | House: Author added Newton | |
2009-03-25 | House: Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to K-12 Education Policy and Oversight | |
2009-03-16 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2009-03-16 | House: Referred by Chair to Local Government Division | |
2009-03-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2009-03-09 | House: Author added Hayden | |
2009-02-26 | House: Author added Kahn | |
2009-02-19 | House: Authors added Persell, Tillberry and Murphy, E. | |
2009-02-16 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment Policy and Oversight |