MN HF882 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Author stricken Her
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Author stricken Her
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General education basic formula allowance increased by three percentage points per year, general education basic formula allowance future increases linked to rate of inflation, and money appropriated.
Title
General education basic formula allowance increased by three percentage points per year, general education basic formula allowance future increases linked to rate of inflation, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Author stricken Her |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1028 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy