MN HF864 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public housing preservation and additional housing infrastructure bond issuance funding provided, senior housing added to allowable uses of housing infrastructure bonds, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Public housing preservation and additional housing infrastructure bond issuance funding provided, senior housing added to allowable uses of housing infrastructure bonds, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-02-13 | House | Authors added Slocum and Hamilton. |
2017-02-09 | House | Authors added Carlson, L.; Youakim; Carlson, A.; Thissen; and Schultz. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF666 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Referred to Capital Investment