MN HF861 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Anderson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Anderson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime victim grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Crime victim grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Anderson |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Winkler |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Gomez |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2104 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy