MN HF848 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Motion did not prevail vote: 62-71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Motion did not prevail vote: 62-71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Collective bargaining agreements ratified.
Title
Collective bargaining agreements ratified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House: Suspension of Rules (Y: 62 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 62-71 |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Masin. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Fenton. |
2017-03-16 | House | Author added Omar. |
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Ecklund. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF673 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Author added Marty