MN HF809 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Louis and Lake Counties Regional Railroad Authority grant availability extended.
Title
St. Louis and Lake Counties Regional Railroad Authority grant availability extended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division |
2019-03-05 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1145 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance