MN HF802 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Masin
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Electric utility renewable energy standard obligations modified, and Public Utility Commission authority modified to issue site permit for electric generation facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utility renewable energy standard obligations modified, and Public Utility Commission authority modified to issue site permit for electric generation facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseAuthor added Masin
2021-03-15HouseAuthors added Hollins and Freiberg
2021-03-09HouseAuthor added Feist
2021-03-04HouseAuthor added Gomez
2021-02-25HouseAuthor added Greenman
2021-02-22HouseAuthors added Noor, Thompson, Koegel, and Mariani
2021-02-18HouseAuthor added Fischer
2021-02-15HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2021-02-11HouseAuthor added Carlson
2021-02-10HouseAuthors added Pryor; Hassan; Xiong, T.; Lillie; Her; Sandell; and Vang
2021-02-08HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1713 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback