MN HF783 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary body art technician supervisor requirements modified.
Title
Temporary body art technician supervisor requirements modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-01 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF326 |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF326 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 29 05/17/2019