MN HF749 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taking of turtles provisions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taking of turtles provisions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26HouseAuthor added Bahner
2020-03-09HouseAuthor added Hausman
2020-03-04HouseAuthor added Her
2020-03-02HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2020-02-11HouseAuthor added Brand
2019-02-04HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1700 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback