MN SF1700 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Turtle taking provisions modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Turtle taking provisions modification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateAuthor added Marty
2020-03-04SenateAuthors added Cwodzinski; Wiklund; Eaton
2019-02-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2019-02-25SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF749 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Author added Bahner

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback