MN HF707 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal sexual conduct provisions modified and clarified, and new sexual extortion crime created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal sexual conduct provisions modified and clarified, and new sexual extortion crime created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseSecond reading
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2021-04-09HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-04-06HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-03-25HouseAuthors added Jordan; Olson, L.; Hollins; Youakim; Richardson; Christensen; Berg; Bierman; Her; Huot; Bernardy; Kotyza-Witthuhn; Becker-Finn; Davnie; Morrison; Koegel; Acomb; Hassan; Ecklund; Liebling; Reyer; Raleigh; Novotny; Urdahl; Davids; Poston and Franson
2021-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
2021-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-02-18HouseAuthor added Pinto
2021-02-08HouseAuthors added Hanson, J.; Stephenson; Bahner; Wazlawik; and Miller
2021-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1683 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Authors added Murphy; Port; Coleman; Bigham

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback