MN HF707 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus legacy bill.
Title
Omnibus legacy bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 73 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 73 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 91 | |
2017-05-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-05-26 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Third reading vote: 64-3 |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-21 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 64-3 |
2017-05-21 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 106-28 |
2017-05-21 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-21 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 88-45 |
2017-05-21 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate conferees Ruud, Ingebrigtsen, Senjem, Lang, Cohen |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-24 | House | House conferees Gunther, Fabian, Torkelson, Green,and Lillie. |
2017-04-24 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate conferees Ruud; Ingebrigtsen; Senjem; Lang; Cohen |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House conferees Gunther; Fabian; Torkelson; Green; Lillie |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 52-12 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-04-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 131-0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-04-04 | House | Amended |
2017-03-31 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Funding Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF566 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - HF substituted in committee HF707