MN HF704 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Long
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Long
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ethnic studies requirement created, Ethnic Studies Task Force created, rulemaking authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Ethnic studies requirement created, Ethnic Studies Task Force created, rulemaking authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Masin |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Her and Hassan |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Frazier; Xiong, J.; and Vang |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1676 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy