MN HF703 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Author added Wiener
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Author added Wiener
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Product stewardship program required for wind and solar infrastructure, and fee provided on retail sales of wind and solar infrastructure, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Product stewardship program required for wind and solar infrastructure, and fee provided on retail sales of wind and solar infrastructure, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Spencer Igo [R] | Rep. John Burkel [R] |
Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] | Rep. Mike Wiener [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Wiener |
2023-01-26 | House | Author added Schultz |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Burkel |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4078 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy