MN HF682 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Destination Medical Center; public infrastructure definition modified, and local matching contribution clarified.
Title
Destination Medical Center; public infrastructure definition modified, and local matching contribution clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2015-02-12 | House | Authors added Liebling and Davids. |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Greater Minnesota Economic and Workforce Development Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF762 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes