MN HF677 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Division action, return to Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Division action, return to Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mail balloting authorized in any town or city with fewer than 400 registered voters.
Title
Mail balloting authorized in any town or city with fewer than 400 registered voters.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Division action, return to Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF422 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections