MN HF665 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State general levy on seasonal recreational property phased out over five years, and automatic inflation of the state general levy eliminated.
Title
State general levy on seasonal recreational property phased out over five years, and automatic inflation of the state general levy eliminated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Greater Minnesota Economic and Workforce Development Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2949 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Referred to Taxes