MN HF65 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Replacement license plate fees established, and design requirements amended for enhanced driver's licenses and enhanced identification cards.
Title
Replacement license plate fees established, and design requirements amended for enhanced driver's licenses and enhanced identification cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: H. F. No. 65 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: H. F. No. 65 (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: H. F. No. 65 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: H. F. No. 65 (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Secretary of State Chapter 3 | |
2020-06-18 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-06-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-06-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-06-12 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-06-12 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-06-12 | House | Amended |
2020-06-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-12 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-06-12 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-06-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF10 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Laid on table