MN HF644 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author stricken Masin.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author stricken Masin.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Massage and bodywork therapy registration and fees established, and exchange of information provided.
Title
Massage and bodywork therapy registration and fees established, and exchange of information provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
Sen. Dan Schoen [D] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Sen. Carolyn Laine [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Author stricken Masin. |
2016-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2016-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices |
2016-03-10 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2015-02-18 | House | Author added Lien. |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1310 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance