MN HF643 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Authors added Poston and Backer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Authors added Poston and Backer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abortions prohibited when a fetal heartbeat is detected with certain exceptions, and penalties provided.
Title
Abortions prohibited when a fetal heartbeat is detected with certain exceptions, and penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Poston and Backer |
2021-02-08 | House | Author stricken Akland |
2021-02-04 | House | Authors added Akland and Daniels |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF356 (Similar To) 2021-02-01 - Author added Dornink