MN HF639 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clean water fund funding provided, soil and water conservation district fee and county eligibility provided, rulemaking required, studies and reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Clean water fund funding provided, soil and water conservation district fee and county eligibility provided, rulemaking required, studies and reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Legacy Finance |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1342 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance