MN HF630 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus K-12 education policy and finance bill.
Title
Omnibus K-12 education policy and finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-18 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 78 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-18 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-18 - House - House: Refuse to Adopt (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 60 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 67 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 63 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 66 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-18 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-18 - House - House: Refuse to Adopt (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 60 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 67 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 63 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 66 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 116 | |
2013-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2013-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Third reading vote: 41-26 |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2013-05-19 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2013-05-19 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 41-26 |
2013-05-18 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 78-56 |
2013-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2013-05-18 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 71-61 |
2013-05-18 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 61-71 |
2013-05-18 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2013-05-18 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2013-05-18 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate conferees Wiger; Torres Ray; Stumpf; Johnson; Dahle |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | House conferees Marquart; Mariani; Brynaert; Morgan; Urdahl |
2013-04-29 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2013-04-29 | House | Senate conferees Wiger, Torres Ray, Stumpf, Johnson, Dahle |
2013-04-29 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2013-04-26 | House | House conferees Marquart, Mariani, Brynaert, Morgan, Urdahl |
2013-04-26 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2013-04-26 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 35-28 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF453 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF453, now on General Orders |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-23 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 83-50 |
2013-04-23 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken vote: 73-60 |
2013-04-23 | House | Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendments offered |
2013-04-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-19 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2013-04-15 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Education Finance |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |