MN HF616 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health governing provisions modified, reports required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health governing provisions modified, reports required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Hassan
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF840 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback