MN HF61 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author stricken Frazier
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author stricken Frazier
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of the Ombudsperson for Child Care Providers created, appointments provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Office of the Ombudsperson for Child Care Providers created, appointments provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author stricken Frazier |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-01-25 | House | Author added Akland |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF21 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections