MN HF59 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - Author added LeMieur
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - Author added LeMieur
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School district January 15 deadline repealed by which school districts must reach a collective bargaining agreement or face a state aid penalty.
Title
School district January 15 deadline repealed by which school districts must reach a collective bargaining agreement or face a state aid penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Mary Liz Holberg [R] | Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] |
Rep. Ron Shimanski [R] | Rep. Bob Barrett [R] | Rep. Mike LeMieur [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | House | Author added LeMieur |
2011-01-18 | House | Authors added Shimanski and Barrett |
2011-01-13 | House | Authors added Nornes, Holberg and Anderson, S. |
2011-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0059&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF59&version=0&session=ls87 |