MN HF58 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Manufacturers required to report and maintain prescription drug prices, health plan prescription drug formularies filing required, health care coverage provisions modified, prescription benefit tool requirements established, and prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.
Title
Manufacturers required to report and maintain prescription drug prices, health plan prescription drug formularies filing required, health care coverage provisions modified, prescription benefit tool requirements established, and prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Edelson |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-01-19 | House | Authors added Schultz, Reyer, and Bahner |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF131 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Author added Nelson