MN HF557 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Physician-patient relationship protected by prohibiting noncompete agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician-patient relationship protected by prohibiting noncompete agreements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF350 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback