MN HF525 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pupil transportation adjustment calculation modified, pupil transportation working group provided, and report required.
Title
Pupil transportation adjustment calculation modified, pupil transportation working group provided, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Zerwas |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF238 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Finance and Policy