MN HF525 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Current DWI ignition interlock device pilot program expanded by two years and applied statewide.
Title
Current DWI ignition interlock device pilot program expanded by two years and applied statewide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2009-04-16 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-04-14 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF462 | |
2009-04-02 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-04-01 | House: Authors added Winkler and Sterner | |
2009-03-30 | House: Second reading | |
2009-03-30 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-03-18 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation and Transit Policy and Oversight Division | |
2009-02-05 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0525&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0525.0.pdf |