MN HF520 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription contraceptive supply requirements established; health plans required to cover contraceptives, contraceptive services, sterilization, and related medical services, patient education, and counseling; and accommodations established for eligible organizations.
Title
Prescription contraceptive supply requirements established; health plans required to cover contraceptives, contraceptive services, sterilization, and related medical services, patient education, and counseling; and accommodations established for eligible organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Acomb |
2021-02-08 | House | Authors added Feist, Reyer |
2021-02-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Freiberg, Youakim, Jordan, Bierman, Christensen and Olson, L. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF949 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Authors added Kent; Marty; Franzen; Klein