MN HF4839 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PACE program implemented.
Title
PACE program implemented.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2024-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5007 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Referred to Human Services